Financial history P A K S

Charity number: 1012204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £1.02m £1.06m £1.09m £1.28m
Total expenditure £1.01m £1.05m £1.04m £1.07m £1.16m
Income from government contracts £1.00m £979.23k £1.02m £1.08m £1.15m
Income from government grants N/A £39.57k £31.72k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £500 £0 £0 £15.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £984.40k £1.03m £1.09m £1.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £901 £266 £186 £2.62k £7.06k
Income - Other £0 £39.57k £31.72k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £1.03m £1.04m £1.07m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.18k £1.02m £9.29k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £19.93k £0 £0 £0