COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR SHROPSHIRE AND TELFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the Community in the areas of Shropshire and Telford & Wrekin and in particular the advancement of education, the protection of good health both mental and physical, and the relief of poverty, distress and disability and sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 26 June 1992: Standard registration
- 07 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TELFORD AND WREKIN COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.01k | £47.67k | £482 | £372 | £312 | |
|
Total expenditure | £470.77k | £37.83k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 22 December 2017 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 December 2017 | 691 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 March 2015 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1993, 2 OCTOBER 2000, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 10 JUNE 2003 AND 7 DECEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITARY AUTHORITY AREA OF TELFORD AND WREKIN (OR SUCH OTHER NAME AS IT SHALL BE KNOWN BY) AND SHROPSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR(BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND DISABILITY OR SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
TELFORD AND WREKIN AND SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window