Financial history BROTHERS AND SISTERS IN CHRIST TRUST

Charity number: 1012231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.22k £3.57k £3.85k £2.90k £1.97k
Total expenditure £3.95k £3.75k £3.99k £2.76k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A