BILLINGHAY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY (SWIMMING) POOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of outdoor swimming facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Gardner | Chair | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
EMILY DIXON | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA BRYANT | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.00k | £15.08k | £24.37k | £35.01k | £28.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.57k | £22.12k | £23.31k | £32.76k | £31.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.12k | £13.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SWIMMING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BILLINGHAY AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
BILLINGHAY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Billinghay Swimming Pool
Fen Road
Billinghay
LINCOLN
LN4 4HU
- Phone:
- 01526861383
- Email:
- Billinghaypool@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Billinghaypool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window