DENT GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers grants and bursaries for educational purposes. These are either to educational institutions within the parish of Dent or to individuals under the age of 25 with a connection to the parish of Dent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 June 1992: Standard registration
- DENT GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER FRASER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
David Boulton | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Arthur Peter Fleck | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Russell Silburn | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Wendy Cooke | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
GEOFFREY WOOF | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
CHRIS EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
LINDA CRAGG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.44k | £17.66k | £16.75k | £15.65k | £18.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £14.75k | £17.15k | £19.02k | £9.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 25 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
1(A)IN MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS FOR THE BEING OF ANY VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF DENT WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL CONCERNED. (B)IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION(INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING)OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF DENT OR WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AT A SCHOOL IN THE SAID PARISH AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, (I)IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS,EXHIBITIONS,BURSARIES,MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL,UNIVERSITY,COLLEGE OF EDUCATION,OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL)EDUCATION (II)IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,OUTFITS,CLOTHING,TOOLS,INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION(INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS),TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF,OR TO PREPARE FOR AND ENTER A PROFESSION,TRADE,OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL,UNIVERSITY,OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 26 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rise Hill View
Laning
Dent
SEDBERGH
Cumbria
LA10 5QJ
- Phone:
- 015396 25449
- Email:
- Dgsef1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window