Trustees DENT GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1012330

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER FRASER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
David Boulton | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Arthur Peter Fleck | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Russell Silburn | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Wendy Cooke | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
GEOFFREY WOOF | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||
CHRIS EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
LINDA CRAGG | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.