Accounts and annual returns PINHOE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1012342
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 31 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 23 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2010 01 March 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 01 March 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 12 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 18 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 02 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 15 April 2009 On Time