Accounts and annual returns DALLAS ROAD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1012366
Charity reporting is overdue by 347 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 347 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 347 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 July 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 June 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 June 2021 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required