THE CHICKEN SHED THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chickenshed is established for the advancement of education in the fields of the arts, principally for the benefit of young persons including all who may require help with mobility, communication, behaviour or self-help skills or with social development with a view to educating them in such fields, integrate them into the community and assist them in their development as members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,810,144
Donations and legacies | £290.18k | |
Charitable activities | £2.97m | |
Other trading activities | £474.34k | |
Investments | £21.10k | |
Other | £51.24k |
Total expenditure:
£3,652,130
Raising funds | £650.54k | |
Charitable activities | £2.70m | |
Other | £300.88k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £812,807 from 2 government contract(s) and £377,210 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £951.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.70m | |
Retained for future use | £158.01k |
People

107 Employee(s)
19 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY DAVID GIBBON | Chair | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Ward | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Murray Leonard Orr | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Brendan Kerr | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Croft | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theodor Sergiou | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Margaret Hall | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris de Pury | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aref Hisham Lahham | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Allford | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Luke Millican | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Lock | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gafsen | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Muldoon | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Vela-Hitchcox | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETE CONSTANTI | Trustee | 07 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SIGMUND SHALIT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE HON NATASHA RAYNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
LADY JANE ANTONIA FRANCES RAYNE LACEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99m | £3.35m | £3.86m | £3.94m | £3.81m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59m | £2.92m | £3.20m | £3.45m | £3.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £479.15k | £493.82k | £573.82k | £640.11k | £812.81k | |
|
Income from government grants | £75.25k | £918.63k | £688.98k | £387.93k | £377.21k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £482.90k | £675.31k | £655.46k | £293.90k | £290.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.15m | £6.38k | £281.56k | £541.40k | £474.34k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.36m | £1.97m | £2.51m | £3.06m | £2.97m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £703 | £690 | £109 | £3.74k | £21.10k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £695.22k | £412.23k | £39.50k | £51.24k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £57.80k | £25.00k | £20.00k | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.49m | £2.18m | £2.59m | £2.63m | £2.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.10m | £733.31k | £611.58k | £557.06k | £650.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £75.74k | £73.11k | £72.76k | £76.00k | £86.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £261.67k | £300.88k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.31m | £2.29m | £2.20m | £2.25m | £2.17m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £741.91k | £1.29m | £1.91m | £2.27m | £2.74m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £472.59k | £563.61k | £436.36k | £346.89k | £582.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE FIELD OF FINE ARTS, HISTORY OF ART, ARCHITECTURE, DRAMA, OPERA, BALLET, MUSIC AND ANY OTHER PURELY CULTURAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED IT SHALL BE CHARITABLE PRINCIPALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THOSE WHO REQUIRE HELP WITH MOBILITY, COMMUNICATION, BEHAVIOUR OR SELF HELP SKILLS OR WITH SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT WITH A VIEW TO EDUCATING THEM IN SUCH FIELDS, INTEGRATING THEM INTO THE COMMUNITY AND ASSISTING THEM IN THEIR DEVELOPMENT AS FULL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (2)THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE TRUST MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
290 CHASE SIDE
SOUTHGATE
LONDON
N14 4PE
- Phone:
- 02082162712
- Email:
- info@chickenshed.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window