THEATRE DE COMPLICITE EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating and producing new theatrical productions and providing an educational programme to accompany and complement this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,054,266
Donations and legacies | £434.37k | |
Charitable activities | £1.56m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.99k | |
Other | £56.95k |
Total expenditure:
£2,026,918
Raising funds | £29.77k | |
Charitable activities | £2.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £401,813 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £29.77k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.00m | |
Retained for future use | £27.35k |
People

20 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 1992: Standard registration
- COMPLICITE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOM MORRIS | Chair | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jeffreys | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Stevenson | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gerald Flamman | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Inua Ellams | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|||||
NITIN SAWHNEY | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frances Hughes | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £523.27k | £830.58k | £871.04k | £1.89m | £2.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £786.27k | £736.99k | £1.01m | £2.36m | £2.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £363.62k | £411.50k | £502.54k | £370.31k | £401.81k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £413.73k | £721.96k | £683.01k | £443.99k | £434.37k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £90.98k | £86.88k | £184.10k | £1.13m | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.78k | £6.74k | £3.93k | £10.13k | £3.99k | |
|
Income - Other | £12.78k | £15.00k | £0 | £310.00k | £56.95k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £310.00k | £94.58k | £10.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £782.77k | £710.84k | £485.05k | £2.34m | £2.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.50k | £26.15k | £17.79k | £21.59k | £29.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.54k | £10.00k | £10.40k | £10.49k | £13.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £509.87k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3 | £994 | £1.39k | £263 | £553 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.56m | £1.58m | £1.47m | £1.23m | £1.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £142.59k | £66.40k | £97.81k | £328.62k | £223.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28/6/91 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 NOV 2023 as amended on 03 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
To establish, promote, equip, organise and manage educational workshops in the promotion of the theatre of the arts, to present and promote the production of plays, operas, variety performances, concerts, dramatic, musical and artistic performances and exhibitions of any description; to engage, employ and supply the services of artistes, dancers, choreographers, musicians, authors, dramatists, instructors, entertainers and to enter into contracts with any artistes, or persons or companies (theatrical or otherwise) for the production and representation of stage plays, ballets, variety entertainments, scenarios, pantomimes and performances; to organise tours and exhibitions within and outside the United Kingdom; to carry on the business of musicians, singers, composers and writers of every and any description; to carry on the business of entertainers, actors and/or actresses, opera singers and general entertainers of every and any description; to enter into any contracts and other arrangements of all kinds with persons having dealings with the Company on such terms and for such periods of time as the Company may from time to time determine, on a commission or fee basis or otherwise; to enter into film and other contracts of all kinds; to carry on the business of theatrical agents and artistes’ managers of every and any description; to carry on the business of writers and composers; theatrical agents and general entertainers of all kinds; and to carry on any other trade or business whatever of a like and similar nature.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jolt Studios
27 St Aldate Street
Kings Square
Gloucester
GL1 1RP
- Phone:
- 02074857700
- Email:
- email@complicite.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window