Financial history BRISTOL CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1012557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £794.27k £863.46k £837.42k £799.06k £911.85k
Total expenditure £833.96k £874.31k £866.50k £756.90k £837.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £142.12k £146.00k
Income from government grants £146.12k £146.21k £560.00k £238.88k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £46.42k £56.65k £1.77k £14.42k £29.39k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £747.82k £806.78k £832.01k £782.43k £882.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40 £33 £2 £42 £139
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.64k £2.16k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £831.11k £874.31k £866.50k £756.90k £837.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.85k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.42k £0 £6.57k £7.06k £7.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £413.88k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0