Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE WOLVERHAMPTON AND MIDLAND COUNTIES EYE INFIRMARY

Charity number: 1012606
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 September 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 17 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 23 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2017 On Time