Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE WOLVERHAMPTON AND MIDLAND COUNTIES EYE INFIRMARY

Charity number: 1012606
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £10.72k £8.37k £132.32k £9.21k £7.31k
Total expenditure £200.79k £1.29k £16.83k £25.72k £161.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A