MOTHERS FOR MOTHERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support mothers of children from birth to age 3 who are suffering from PNI, post-natal illness. We also support mothers who are pregnant who have depression/anxiety. We offer training to health professionals, and information to family members of the women affected. We offer one-to-one counselling and we also run support/therapeutic groups for affected mothers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 July 1992: Standard registration
- 26 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 26 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1185281 MOTHERS FOR MOTHERS
- POST-NATAL DEPRESSION SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.03k | £110.74k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.95k | £102.57k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.46k | £9.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 10 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION OF RELIEF CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO WOMEN SUFFERING FROM EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISORDER ASSOCIATED WITH CHILDBIRTH, SUCH AS ANXIETY NEUROSIS, POST NATAL DEPRESSION AND PUERPERAL PSYCHOSIS. B) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF EDUCATION AND CARE IN ALL MATTERS CONCERNING PSYCHIATRIC DISORDER ASSOCIATED WITH CHILDBARING.
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY OF AVON THE FORMER COUNTY OF AVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window