ICARE DAY CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a wide range of on-going, effective rehabilitation care therapies for stroke victims in a day centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 10 July 1992: Standard registration
- ICARE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Hammond | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Collins | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kevin Frost | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Janet Humphrey | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Eldridge | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Lewis Smith | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Talbot | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Deborah Lloyd Stone | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSE ANN CAPEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.90k | £107.56k | £75.05k | £102.52k | £81.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.61k | £105.56k | £130.03k | £168.02k | £125.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £70.43k | £7.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE, AND TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED CEREBRAL VASCULAR ACCIDENT OR WHO HAVE A DISABLING CEREBRAL CONDITION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BROMLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLOCKWISE
BROMLEY OLD TOWN HALL
30 TWEEDY ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 3FE
- Phone:
- 01689862883
- Email:
- ENQUIRIES@FROSTBR.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.FROSTGROUP.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window