FIRST STEPS (BATH)

Charity Number: 1012690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

First Steps (Bath) is a Registered Charity and an accredited Social Enterprise. Our aim is to improve outcomes for young children in areas of need by working alongside their families and other professionals, through our Early Childhood Community Centres at Woodhouse Road, Twerton and at Moorfields Road and our Specialist Early Years Centre, Bath Opportunity Pre School, (BOP), Frome Road, Bath.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1992: Standard registration
  • 03 May 2019: Funds received from 1104907 BATH OPPORTUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FIRST STEPS CENTRE (Working name)
  • FIRST STEPS MOORLANDS (Working name)
  • FIRST STEPS CENTRE FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES (BATH) (Previous name)
  • FIRST STEPS NURSERY (BATH) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACEY FARWELL Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Mir Abdullah Miri Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
James Salkeld Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Lysha Goode Trustee 16 July 2024
None on record
Jayanna Witt Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Elisabeth Barratt Hacking Trustee 21 July 2020
None on record
Simon Andrews Trustee 19 April 2019
None on record
Marina Sloan Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record
ISOBEL MICHAEL Trustee 18 July 2017
DOG ASSISTANCE IN DISABILITY
Received: On time
Dr Janet Rose Trustee 12 June 2016
None on record
MEG Gore Trustee 04 December 2012
None on record
VALERIE WHEELER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.21m £1.42m £1.32m £1.59m £1.73m
Total expenditure £1.21m £1.24m £1.37m £1.54m £1.86m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200.00k £200.00k £201.67k £211.00k £251.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £48.99k £163.81k £35.24k £59.17k £32.48k
Income - Other trading activities £27.15k £17.16k £21.20k £29.45k £38.21k
Income - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.24m £1.26m £1.50m £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £573 £146 £45 £2.16k £7.72k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.24m £1.37m £1.54m £1.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.55k £6.71k £6.00k £7.54k £12.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.45m £1.42m £1.39m £1.36m £1.33m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £314.62k £512.83k £504.34k £577.32k £555.53k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £76.75k £56.03k £66.35k £69.25k £151.60k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
First Steps
Woodhouse Road
Bath
BA2 1SY
Phone:
01225444791