Basildon & Billericay U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an autonomous self-help learning organisation run by the voluntary efforts of our members. Our members come together to share and pursue learning and related social activies, and are in their third age, the period in life when, after childhood, full-time employment and parental responsibilities, time can be found for personal interests and creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 09 July 1992: Standard registration
- BASILDON AND BILLERICAY U 3 A (Working name)
- THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, BASILDON AND BILLERICAY (Previous name)
- THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE, BASILDON,BILLERICAY AND BRENTWOOD (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Randall | Chair | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Way | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Janice Burgess | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Grahame Fletcher | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart King | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Elizabeth Wood | Trustee | 18 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.23k | £5.26k | £18.94k | £12.92k | £13.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.86k | £2.01k | £11.18k | £12.51k | £14.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OPERATIVE FROM 16 MAY 1991 AS AMENDED 30 JANUARY 1997, JULY 1997, 23RD NOVEMBER 2000 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUN 2018 as amended on 07 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BASILDON, BILLERICAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Scott Drive
WICKFORD
Essex
SS12 9PW
- Phone:
- 01268570527
- Email:
- margaret.way@talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window