Financial history VINTAGE BRASS SENIOR CITIZENS BAND

Charity number: 1012709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.20k £2.46k £3.64k £4.20k
Total expenditure £440 £2.88k £3.47k £3.99k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A