SOUTH EAST COUNTIES BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 1012734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

This is primarily an activity associated with the South-East Counties Womens Football League which assists players who sustain injuries whilst playing football and who subsequently could do with a bit of financial assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £215
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LIONEL JAMES WOODWARD Chair
None on record
PETER BARRETT Trustee
None on record
GERALD STREET Trustee
None on record
NEIL BLABER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £531 £6 £502 £70 £215
Total expenditure £160 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 SINGLETON ROAD
BROADBRIDGE HEATH
HORSHAM
RH12 3NP
Phone:
07714258602
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available