Financial history BARKING AND DAGENHAM COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1012737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £333.17k £404.97k £345.57k £487.01k £426.96k
Total expenditure £303.40k £338.46k £338.37k £447.35k £413.21k
Income from government contracts £12.00k £83.43k £69.22k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.32k £6.36k N/A £190.96k £126.91k