Financial history THE CHRISTINE WOODMANCY (REED) CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1012761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.70k £16.09k £16.77k £18.24k £18.70k
Total expenditure £23.49k £8.02k £24.01k £17.40k £18.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A