DARWEN AND BLACKBURN TRANSPORT SERVICES LIMITED DIAL-A-RIDE SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of ambulance services, for elderly and disabled people,vehicles fitted with wheel chair lifts for disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 July 1992: Standard registration
- 07 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DIAL-A-RIDE (Working name)
- DARWEN & BLACKBURN TRANSPORT SERVICES LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.92k | £138.56k | £150.71k | £157.38k | £167.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.38k | £137.33k | £142.38k | £155.51k | £164.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 16 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 12 July 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 09 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 05 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 26 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 02 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 7 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
A.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE PROVIDED THAT:- 1.SUCH FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED AND; 2.THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,POVERTY OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; B.THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND PROVISION OF AID TO THE POOR AND NEEDY;C.THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND AGED;D.TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE FOR YOUNG PERSONS FOR A PERIOD NOT EXCEEDING TWELVE MONTHS IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY OBTAIN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window