CONEWOOD STREET CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of day nursery services for under 5's in L B Islington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income:
£703,208
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £325.74k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £105 | |
Other | £377.36k |
Total expenditure:
£682,023
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £682.02k | |
Other | £0 |
£6,692 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £373,788 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £682.02k | |
Retained for future use | £21.19k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £682.02k | |
Retained for future use | £27.88k |
People

23 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 July 1992: Standard registration
- CONEWOOD STREET CHILDREN;S CENTRE (Previous name)
- MARTINEAU COMMUNITY NURSERY (Previous name)
- MARTINEAU DAY NURSERY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Hostert | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Kelway | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Akpowerene Onomor | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Olasumbo Adebola Biobaku-Mason | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Candice Henrietta Allen | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Mary Reed | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Anne Rose SHEPHERD | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Rose Shepherd | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edward Glasson | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £828.69k | £815.19k | £803.87k | £727.59k | £703.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £750.70k | £813.23k | £848.34k | £751.09k | £682.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £526.59k | £507.23k | £423.49k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £584.90k | £8.70k | £22.70k | N/A | £373.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.03k | £2.24k | £5.54k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £241.54k | £260.64k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £230.10k | £562.16k | £529.93k | £281.97k | £325.74k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.66k | £9.24k | £96 | £7.67k | £105 | |
|
Income - Other | £584.90k | £0 | £0 | £437.95k | £377.36k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £702.15k | £813.23k | £848.34k | £691.78k | £682.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £48.55k | £60.72k | £59.75k | £59.30k | £50.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £59.30k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.19k | £704 | £352 | £4.00k | £3.64k | |
|
Long-term investments | £300.00k | £292.55k | £312.86k | £315.78k | £322.47k | |
|
Other assets | £394.32k | £399.93k | £354.67k | £346.67k | £347.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £39.79k | £31.97k | £30.81k | £49.95k | £29.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AGED UNDER THE COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE IN THE DESIGNATED AREA BY THE PROVISION OF SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY; (2) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID CHILDREN; (3) BY PROVIDING SUCH CARE AS MAY PROMOTE THE SOCIAL, INTELLECTUAL, PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN; AND (4) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO ORGANISE ACCESSIBLE, COHERENT AND EFFECTIVE SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES IN THE DESIGNATED AREA, WHICH INCLUDES: INTEGRATED EARLY YEARS EDUCATION AND CHILDCARE; HEALTH AND FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES; AND TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON (IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Conewood Street Childrens Centre
14 Conewood Street
LONDON
N5 1DL
- Phone:
- 02075274424
- Email:
- ana.plaza@islington.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window