2ND KIMBERLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1012853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide education and social activities for young people in the Kimberley and surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £42,243
Total expenditure: £35,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Roberts Chair 16 September 2024
None on record
Charlotte Craig Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Lisa Hayman Tansley Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Rosalind Broker Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Jane Maltby Trustee
None on record
Richard Maltby Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.27k £26.06k £28.89k £41.74k £42.24k
Total expenditure £39.51k £23.95k £27.35k £47.30k £35.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k N/A £17.00k £7.53k £7.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KETTLEBROOK LODGE
EASTWOOD ROAD
KIMBERLEY
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 2HX
Phone:
0115 938 9205