Accounts and annual returns THE UKANA MATERNITY HOSPITAL PROJECT

Charity number: 1012893
Charity reporting is overdue by 1619 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 524 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 524 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 889 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 889 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1254 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1254 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1619 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1619 days