THE UKANA MATERNITY HOSPITAL PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has constructed a Maternity Hospital in Ukana, a remote rural town in Enugu State, Eastern Nigeria. Its completion has made available a local hospital that serves all the neighbouring towns. Babies are being delivered there with the support of trained midwives. The Charity is now in the process of trying to acquire essential medical equipment and still needs ongoing financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2014
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nigeria
Governance
- 16 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR UGOCHUKWU EKEOWA | Trustee | 08 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
VICKY NGOZI EKEOWA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ESTHER UGWUNKWO | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR MRS GLORIA OKAFOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEATRICE AGU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD NWAORA EKEOWA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 153 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 153 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 519 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 519 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 884 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 884 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1249 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1249 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1614 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1614 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS IN UKANA, NIGERIA BY CONSTRUCTING AND THEREAFTER MAINTAINING A MATERNITY HOSPITAL WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
UKANA PROVINCE (NIGERIA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 37
Ashbourne Court
137 Daubeney Road
London
E5 0EJ
- Phone:
- 02089851245
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window