Financial history CULT INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1012914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.46k £8.00k £4.56k £4.01k £3.08k
Total expenditure £6.86k £3.33k £3.27k £3.73k £4.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A