CULT INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CIC Provides information and advice on Cults. It offers help to ex cult members, families of cult members and the general public. It assists students/researchers with bibliographies and other information for projects, academic papers and books. CIC gives talks to schools, colleges, universities, clubs, professional and religious groups. CIC maintains a reliable international network of contacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.46k | £8.00k | £4.56k | £4.01k | £3.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.86k | £3.33k | £3.27k | £3.73k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 March 2025 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING BY THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO RELIGIONS AND THOSE MOVEMENTS CONCERNED WITH THE EXPLORATION OF SPIRITUAL LIFE OR PHILOSOPHIES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CIC
BCM CULTS
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 08454500868
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window