THE COLLEGIATE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has appointed an Interim Manager Open in new window for the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; (2) TO PROVIDE CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE / SUPPORT TO BE PURSUED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income:
£6,893,706
Donations and legacies | £31 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.89m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,778,901
Raising funds | £6.58m | |
Charitable activities | £203.83k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.58m | |
Charitable expenditure | £203.83k | |
Retained for future use | £114.81k |
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- QUEEN ETHELBURGA'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE COLLEGIATE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Martin | Chair | 30 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Christopher Hall | Trustee | 30 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS DAVID MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.79m | £13.40m | £8.89m | £9.01m | £6.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.73m | £13.93m | £8.88m | £8.85m | £6.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.52m | £4.70m | £16 | £108 | £31 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.27m | £8.70m | £8.89m | £9.01m | £6.89m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.83m | £5.62m | £384.13k | £250.83k | £203.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.89m | £8.31m | £8.49m | £8.60m | £6.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.77m | £970.35k | £986.15k | £1.68m | £1.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.32m | £1.05m | £1.05m | £1.58m | £1.05m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
|||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/10/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/02/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BAINES TRAVEL BURSARY
- BARTLETT PRIZE
- BERRY GEOGRAPHY PRIZE
- CHRIMES PRIZE
- CRAGG PRIZE
- DUNCAN PRIZE
- FIELD STUDY PRIZE
- HUGH BRIGHT PRIZE
- HUNTER PRIZE
- JUNIOR PUBLIC SPEAKING PRIZE
- KENNEDY PRIZE
- KINGDON PUBLIC SPEAKING PRIZE
- MARGARET FLEMING WYLIE PRIZE
- PARRY PRIZE
- POETRY PRIZE
- SCHWEITZER MEMORIAL PRIZE
- SHORT PRIZE
- WHITLEY PRIZE
- 21 July 1993 : Standard registration
- 10 February 2005 : Removed
- 10 February 2005 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRP ADVISORY TRADING LIMITED
110 CANNON STREET
LONDON
EC4N 6EU
- Phone:
- 02030054000
- Email:
- CP.LONDON@FRPADVISORY.COM
- Website:
-
queenethelburgas.edu
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window