HOMELESS IN OSWESTRY ACTION PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 July 1992: Standard registration
- 02 February 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 February 2009: Funds transferred to 1124644 SHROPSHIRE HOUSING ALLIANCE
- H O A P (Working name)
- HOMELESS IN OSWESTRY ACTION PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2004 | 04/04/2005 | 04/04/2006 | 04/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.56k | £235.14k | £264.94k | £284.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.70k | £226.99k | £272.31k | £285.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 04 April 2007 | 15 April 2008 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2007 | 07 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 04 April 2006 | 01 May 2007 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2006 | 18 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 04 April 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 04 April 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2004 | 20 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1991 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 1992, 11 JULY 2000, 15 JULY 2003 AND 13 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ASSIST PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND IN HOUSING NEED WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window