THE SOUTHSEA SHAKESPEARE ACTORS

Charity number: 1013000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Theatre and Theatre Education in the Local Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £11,287
Total expenditure: £11,406

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TERRY WISEMAN Chair
None on record
Ceri Jones Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
Vincent Adams Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
David Pearson Trustee 16 May 2017
None on record
ROBERT BARTLETT Trustee 19 July 2012
None on record
LAUREN FARNHILL Trustee
None on record
NEIL GREGORY-READER Trustee
None on record
NICHOLAS DOWNES Trustee
None on record
JAMES ROWLAND Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, FAREHAM
Received: On time
PAULA BARTLETT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £5.68k £6.01k £18.29k £15.61k £11.29k
Total expenditure £5.17k £7.06k £10.35k £11.90k £11.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.24k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 08 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 29 April 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Peak Drive
Fareham
PO14 1RL
Phone:
07876493009