Trustees SEA WATCH FOUNDATION, THE CETACEAN MONITORING UNIT
Charity number: 1013002

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Elizabeth Baker | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES JEFFREY WAGGITT | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL EDWARD BAINES | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE ROBERT MARK SMITH | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES ROBERT BORAN | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE SAMUEL BOYER | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH MARY PARKINSON | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG MILLER | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Russell Turner BSc DPhil | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GRAHAM JOHN PIERCE BSC PHD | Trustee | 29 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY NEIL OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.