Financial history LYTHAM ST ANNES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1013058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.43k £3.35k £11.94k £12.82k £6.52k
Total expenditure £5.77k £4.79k £11.32k £5.00k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A