Trustees LYTHAM ST ANNES UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1013058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirley Mary Dickson Chair 14 April 2023
None on record
Ian Stewart Dickson Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Belinda Lea Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Janet Breame Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Julie Tyldesley Trustee 14 March 2025
None on record
Christine Holland Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Colin Russell Trustee 12 April 2024
None on record
Peter Thomas Walley Trustee 12 April 2024
None on record
Linda Mary Adams Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Michael John Ripley Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
Barbara Pollitt Trustee 09 April 2021
None on record