SELBY DISTRICT TALKING NEWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing local weekly news in a suitable format for blind, partially sighted or for people who for some reason cannot hold a newspaper
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 July 1992: Standard registration
- 23 December 2021: Funds received from 1027646 GOOLE AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Edward Calvert | Chair | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Calvert | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWARD STELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN HEADLAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
LYNNE BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE STELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EILEEN FENTEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £0 | £1.24k | £1.17k | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £535 | £179 | £595 | £438 | £438 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER TEMPORY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RCORDED TAPES OR TACTILE READING MATTER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE SELBY DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cunliffe Centre
Petre Avenue
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01757228156
- Email:
- andrewcalvert46@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window