Accounts and annual returns FAWCETT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1013167
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 June 2019 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required