Financial history NEHRU CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1013208
Charity reporting is overdue by 1464 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019
Total gross income £1.12k £815 £1.41k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A