Financial history AMALIA MUSLIM U K JAMAAT

Charity Number: 1013210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £4.20k £4.41k £4.47k £2.21k £3.17k
Total expenditure £500 £2.47k £502 £1.88k £13.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A