SALUKI WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF THE SALUKI BREED OF DOG FROM SUFFERING OR MALTREATMENT. IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR UNWANTED OR HOMELESS SALUKI'S UNTIL PERMANENT HOMES CAN BE FOUND FOR THEM AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP AND THE DISCOURAGEMENT OF IRRESPONSIBLE BREEDING OF SALUKI'S.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 July 1992: Standard registration
- SALUKI RESCUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Haywood | Chair | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlie McLenahan | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John McCormick Smith | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Frieda Robb | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Penda | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Alexander Steele | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Garratt | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Boutwell | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Layton-Smith | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Hartley | Trustee | 02 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.25k | £19.75k | £26.19k | £12.33k | £20.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.34k | £14.55k | £18.15k | £9.56k | £18.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCT 2018 as amended on 14 Aug 2021 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE SALUKI BREED OF DOG FROM SUFFERING INJURY OR MALTREATMENT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING)1.THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR UNWANTED OR HOMELESS SALUKIS, UNTIL PERMANENT HOMES CAN BE FOUND.2.THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP,AND THE DISCOURAGEMENT OF IRRESPONSIBLE BREEDING OF SALUKIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 New Street
PORTLAND
Dorset
DT5 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01305 824133
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window