Governing document SALUKI WELFARE FUND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 19/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCT 2018 as amended on 14 Aug 2021 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE SALUKI BREED OF DOG FROM SUFFERING INJURY OR MALTREATMENT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING)1.THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR UNWANTED OR HOMELESS SALUKIS, UNTIL PERMANENT HOMES CAN BE FOUND.2.THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP,AND THE DISCOURAGEMENT OF IRRESPONSIBLE BREEDING OF SALUKIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.