THE BASINGSTOKE AND ALTON CARDIAC REHABILITATION CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons suffering from, or at risk of, heart and coronary illness, particularly those in Basingstoke and Alton and the surrounding areas, through the provision of exercise and health education. Also the conduct of research projects connected with cardiac rehabilitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,935 from 7 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 30 July 1992: Standard registration
- CARDIAC REHAB (Working name)
- REHAB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MICHAEL GEORGE HAYWARD | Chair | 11 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Ruth Frost | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ball | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Turner | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Osama Alsanjari | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Gardham | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charman | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Burgess | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Henshaw | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Lewis | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr HUGH JAMES NEWTON BETHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £368.61k | £448.43k | £522.48k | £373.78k | £415.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £372.37k | £339.13k | £469.66k | £437.40k | £438.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.05k | £78.34k | £27.26k | £19.28k | £12.94k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £279.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £104.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £138.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £36 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £54.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £355.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £114.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 JANUARY 2008 AND 28 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 15 May 2019 as amended on 08 Dec 2020 as amended on 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Association is established are (a) The relief of persons suffering from or at risk of heart and coronary illness and other illnesses and medical conditions for which supervised exercise provides rehabilitation or effective intervention by the provision and maintenance of a Cardiac Rehabilitation Unit and other relevant services. (b) The education and assistance of such persons so to develop their understanding of the nature of actual and potential medical conditions particularly heart disease; education in how to avoid the onset or recurrence thereof, and the role of diet, exercise and lifestyle choices so that their conditions of life may be improved. (c) The promotion of research into the causes and treatment of heart and coronary illness and other medical conditions, and the publication of the useful results of such research. (d) The promotion of changes to lifestyles that help to achieve healthier living.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basingstoke & Alton Cardiac Rehab
Cardiac Rehab Centre
Chawton Park Road
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 1RQ
- Phone:
- 01420544794
- Email:
- hearty@cardiac-rehab.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window