BRINDLEY HEATH JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ORGANISE VARIOUS ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR TO ENTERTAIN THE CHILDREN OF THE SCHOOL AND BY WAY OF THIS RAISE FUNDS IN ORDER TO PURCHASE EQUIPMENT AND RESOURCES TO FURTHER ENHANCE AND DEVELOP THEIR LEARNING SKILLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 July 1992: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2012: Re-registered
- 20 May 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 20 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1030466 KINVER PRIMARY FEDERATION PTA
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £9.43k | £7.37k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £9.49k | £4.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 08 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 24 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 10 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 30 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window