Trustees CHORLTON GOOD NEIGHBOURS

Charity number: 1013285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ken Stokes Chair 21 September 2016
None on record
David Joseph Sheppard Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
James Donohue Trustee 22 January 2025
None on record
Allison Sheard Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Mary Theresa O'Mahony Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Michael Schaefer Trustee 07 December 2016
None on record
Rev JENNIFER KING Trustee 18 September 2014
None on record
BERNARD LEACH Trustee
CHRYSALIS (MANCHESTER)
Received: On time
ANDREW PETER DAWSON Trustee
None on record
KATHRYN GRAND Trustee
None on record