WHITE ROSE INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Employment of three workers to work caring for abandoned children, and overseeing our projects, which include support financially for an old peoples home, three schools, two in gypsy villages, citys youth club, pensioners club, and two hospitals. Also providing practical support and donated goods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
- Romania
Governance
- 30 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL SELINA | Trustee | 30 July 1992 |
|
|
||||
christopher barrow | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.91k | £7.42k | £10.53k | £17.61k | £21.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.40k | £6.34k | £21.17k | £18.91k | £34.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 06 June 2023 | 487 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
161 southfield road
95 Huddersfield Road
huddersfield
huddersfield
west yorkshire
HD8 8HF
- Phone:
- 07308305515
- Email:
- candcbarrow@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window