THE DRAKE TRUST

Charity number: 1013294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support education and training activities in the repair and conservation of the heritage environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £10,107
Total expenditure: £3,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel James Cummins Trustee 02 December 2022
None on record
Mark Geoffrey Archer Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Lucy Wilson Trustee 11 November 2016
None on record
Matthew John Slocombe Trustee 08 October 2013
None on record
DORIAN ANDREAS THOMAS ALTDORF CRONE Trustee
None on record
NICOLA CLARE TASKER MA BA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £11.46k £7.45k £6.63k £6.69k £10.11k
Total expenditure £2.72k £19.55k £2.00k £23.80k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
87 EAST SHEEN AVENUE
LONDON
SW14 8AX
Phone:
07951726344
Website:

No information available