THE EASTER TEAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Easter Team helps families and individuals in crisis in the Crawley area by providing and distributing food parcels and topping up gas and electricity pre-payment meters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £7,500 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.01k | £49.37k | £18.41k | £37.25k | £53.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £18.31k | £20.79k | £28.00k | £113.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2/11/90, AMENDED 24/6/92 AND 13TH FEBRUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, SHELTER, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF IN THE BOROUGH OF CRAWLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CRAWLEY IN WEST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window