STROUD VINTAGE TRANSPORT AND ENGINE CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M D SLATER | Chair | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Grange | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Harrison Simper | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kenneth Smith | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.15k | £3.43k | £4.30k | £235.69k | £197.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.50k | £27.39k | £7.09k | £164.08k | £226.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2/10/87 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8/6/92
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN 1) ALL TYPES OF HISTORIC MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TRACTION ENGINES, STEAMROLLERS AND OTHER STEAM VEHICLES. 2) OTHER HISTORIC MOBILE MACHINERY INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING FAIR ORGANS, FAIRGROUND AND SHOWMAN'S EQUIPMENT, AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY AND AGRICULTURAL EQUIPMENT. 3) OTHER HISTORIC MACHINERY OF A STATIC NATURE INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING ALL OR ANY MILL, FACTORY OR INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT AND MACHINERY WHETHER THE SAME BE POWERED BY STEAM, WATER, ELECTRICITY, PETROL OR DIESEL OILS BUT INCLUDING ALSO THOSE DRIVEN BY THE ACTION OF WIND OR TIDE. 4) ALL OR ANY HISTORIC CRAFTS AND CRAFTMANSHIP. B) TO MAKE PAYMENTS IN FAVOUR OF SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 FAR WESTRIP
STROUD
GL6 6HD
- Phone:
- 01453757995
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window