COTSWOLD SHEEP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop the breed of sheep known as the "Cotswold" breed. To maintain the purity and to encourage the improvement and expansion of the breed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE CUNNINGHAM | Chair | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Palfrey | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Stayt | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Bohemia | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVINA STANHOPE | Trustee | 22 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Birtwhistle | Trustee | 22 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marie French | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PARKES | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £8.21k | £8.48k | £9.91k | £11.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93k | £7.57k | £7.29k | £9.32k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS : AGM ON 15TH JUNE 1986,SINCE 15TH JUNE 1986 THERE HAVE BEEN TWO AMENDMENTS WHICH INTRODUCED NEW CLASSES OF MEMBERSHIP. LIFEMEMBERSHIP WAS INTRODUCED BY A VOTE. AMENDED 19 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE BREED OF SHEEP KNOWN AS THE COTSWOLD BREED, TO MAINTAIN THE PURITY AND TO ENCOURAGE THE IMPROVEMENT AND EXPANSION OF THE BREED. AND AS SET OUT IN GREATER DETAIL IN ITEMS 2(A) - 2(K)OF THE COTSWOLD SHEEP SOCIETY'S RULES AND REGULATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED,IN PRACTICE: THE CONSERVATION AND PROMOTION OF T
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 KING GEORGES FIELD
STOW ON THE WOLD
CHELTENHAM
GL54 1AS
- Phone:
- 01451830461
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window