BICESTER SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Church and Healing Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Anne Sheila Plowman | Chair | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Derek Taylor | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Beckett | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rita Clifton | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Young | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
TONY PLOWMAN | Trustee | 17 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ANDREW GOOCH F IDM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.10k | £28.42k | £39.94k | £58.20k | £43.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.86k | £20.31k | £14.93k | £77.55k | £32.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.38k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/5/92 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR THE CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Blenheim
Croughton
Brackley
NN13 5LP
- Phone:
- 01869811352
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window