Listening Post Counselling Service Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of professional counselling to adults of 18 years+. Donation according to means negotiated. Clients mostly in low income bracket & unable to afford counselling elsewhere. 60 volunteer qualified counsellors & mature students in last stage of Diploma/Degree in Counselling staff the service. Centres in Gloucester, Cheltenham & Stroud. Annual programme of training courses & seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 August 1992: Standard registration
- LISTENING POST (Working name)
- LISTENING POST CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Solomon | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ronald George Storey | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Kingston | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Pauline Bayliss-Jones | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Monument | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Macnaughton Sammon | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.44k | £247.99k | £248.02k | £308.51k | £319.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.67k | £181.92k | £258.11k | £277.16k | £326.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.50k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £7.00k | N/A | £3.11k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 04 January 2021 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JUN 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JUL 2016 as amended on 25 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS IN CHRISTIAN AND NON-CHRISTIAN ADULTS WITH EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL PROBLEMS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COUNCIL OF MANAGEMENT MAY THINK FIT, AND PARTICULARLY BY: (I) TRAINING AND EDUCATING LOCAL CHRISTIANS AND NON-CHRISTIANS IN COUNSELLING AND RELATED SUBJECT AREAS (II) PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND RELATED SERVICES WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS AND FOLLOWING CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTER CITY AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Listening Post
St. Mary De Lode Church
St. Mary's Square
GLOUCESTER
GL1 2QT
- Phone:
- 01452383820
- Email:
- admin@lpost.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window